1112 the Edinburgh Gazette, September 11, 1863
Total Page:16
File Type:pdf, Size:1020Kb
1112 THE EDINBURGH GAZETTE, SEPTEMBER 11, 1863. 96th Foot—Major Lord Richard Howe Browne, Queen's Commission. from the 7th Foot, to be Major, vice Grant, who 4th Lancashire Artillery Volunteer Corps. exchanges. Dated 8th September 1863. David Humphreys, gout, to be Adjutant, from the Rifle Brigade — The Honourable Cecil Thomas 10th July 1863. Parker to be Ensign, by purchase, vice the Honourable Frederick Arthur Wellesley, pro- Commission signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the moted in the Coldstream Guards. Dated 8th County of Devon. September 1863. 2d or South Devon Regiment of Militia. Staff-Assistant-Surgeon Julius Wiles to be Assist- ant-Surgeon, vice Francis Stephen Bennet De Castre Fisher Lyne to be Lieutenant. Dated Franjois de Chaumont, M.D., appointed to the 14th August 1863. Staff. Dated 8th September 1863. Commissions signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the 2d West India Regiment—Irving St. John Hart- County of Southampton. ford, gent, to be Ensign, without purchase, vice William Stevens Perry Keene, deceased. Dated 5th Hampshire Rifle Volunteer Corps. 8th September 1863. Lieutenant George Rake to be Captain, vice Ford, promoted. Dated 4th September 1863. MEDICAL DEPARTMENT. Ensign William Grant 'to be Lieutenant, vice Rake, promoted. Dated 4th September 1863. Staff-Surgeon William Braybrooke having com- John Davis to be Ensign, vice Grant, promoted. pleted 20 years' full- pay service to be Staff-Sur- Dated 4th September 1863. geon-Major, under the provisions of the Royal John Groves to be Ensign, vice Lush, resigned. Warrant of 1st October 1858. Dated 1st August Dated 4th September 1863. 1863. • Assistant-Surgeon Francis Stephen Bennet Francois MEMORANDA. de Chaumont, M.D., from the Rifle Brigade, to 2d Hampshire Rifle Volunteer Corps. be Staff-Assistant-Surgeon, vice Julius Wiles, Her Majesty has been graciously pleased to appointed to the Rifle Brigade. Dated 8tb accept the resignation of the Commission held by September 1863. Captain Richard Coles. Dated 28th August 1863. Assistant-Surgeon Peter Davidson, M.D., from the 6th Hampshire Rifle Volunteer Corps. 5th Foot, to' be Staff-Assistant-Surgeon, vice Her Majesty has been graciously pleased to Exbam Long Hiffarnan, appointed to the 5th accept the resignation of the Commission held by Foot. Dated 8th September 1863. Captain Purvis. Dated 26th August 1863. BREVET. Commission signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the Lieutenant-General Sir John Mark Frederic Smith, Tower Hamlets. Royal Engineers, to be General, vice General and Colonel-Commandant John Oldfield, deceased. 6th Tower Hamlets Rifle Volunteers. Dated 3d August 1863. Lieutenant Thomas Edwards to be Captain. Dated Major-General Crighton,'Grierson, retired full-pay 25th August 1863. Royal Engineers, having stood above Major- \ General L. Hall on the effective list of that corps, Commission signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the to be Lieutenant-General. Dated 3d August County of Cornwall. 1863. 15th Duke of Cornwall's Rifle Volunteer Corps. Major-General Lewis Alexander Hall to he Lieu- William Bickford Smith to be Lieutenant. Dated tenant-General, vice Sir John Mark Frederic 28th August 1863. Smith. Dated 3d August 1863. Colonel Henry Servant^ to be Major-General, vice Hall. Dated 3d August 1863. Commission signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the County of Berks. Colonel William Couperus McLeod, commanding a division of the army in the Madras Presidency, 4th Berks Rifle Volunteers. to have the local rank of Major - General Walter James Sedgefield to be Ensign. Dated . while so employed. Dated 8th September 29th August 1863. 1863. Lieutenant-Colonel John Summerfield Hawkins, Commissions signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the Royal Engineers, having completed five years' County of Flint. qualifying service under the' provisions of the Royal Warrant of the 14th October 1858, to be 1st Flintshire Engineer Volunteer Corps. Colonel. Dated 12th August 1863. First Lieutenant Thomas Leacroft Cottinghatn to • Brevet-Lieutenant-Coloiiel Henry Wylie Norman, be Captain. Dated 1 at September 1863. C.B., Bengal Army, to be Aide-de-Camp to Her Reverend Jeremiah Williams, Clerk, to be Chap- Majesty, with the rank of Colonel in the Army. lain. Dated 1st September 1863. Dated 8th September 1863. 2d Flintshire Rifle Volunteer Corps. Hugh Fenton, gent, to be Enaign. Dated 29th August 1863. ADMIRALTY, September 4, 1863. Commission signed by the Lord Lieutenant of the Royal Marine Light Infantry. County of Dumfries. Second Lieutenant Montague Philip Hall Gray to 5th Dumfriesshire Rifle Volunteer Corps. be First Lieutenant, vice O'Grady, deceased. James Little, M.D., to be Honorary Assistant- Commission to be dated 4th July 1863. Surgeon. Dated 31st July 1863..