1 Reg No Name Dob Currently Working Designation T
Total Page:16
File Type:pdf, Size:1020Kb
BATCH – 1 REG NO NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION T Number 3 Balagopal Dr. Chandra. C. J. Retd Profess of Automobile Engg Retd Prof, T19 25.03. 1929 G ,MIT Auto 31220 Mihir Kumar Bal 01.01.1959 SAUD BAHWAN AUTOMOTIVE SDM t24221 KP RAJU 20 04 1950 retired from Indian Airlines Vice President of Premier CV Gopalararao Automobile BATCH – 5 S.NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING 1 R.I.GOPALA KRISHNAN The world bank retd BATCH – 6 NAME CURRENTLY WORKING Durai raj M&M BATCH – 14 REG NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATIO NO N Authiappan. D Govt of India Retd Director, Min of Labour K.Krishnamurthy Business Director 1410 Adhimoolan.K.S temple related activities 1414 R DEVARAJAN ashok leyland retired 1417 T M JAWAHARLAL Secretary,the employers federation of southern india,chennai. 1418 N KAILASAM 36 yrs in Indian oil corporation 1420 K manufacturing engg FMSCI KRISHNAMURTHY 1422 NARENDAR KUMAR GARG senior regional manager,hindustan motors. 1427 V S RAJAGOPALAN retd as joint general manager defence 35 yrs 1430 P RANGASAMY 25 yrs in tata motors. director business development in essae working digitronics pvt ltd. 1432 P SENGODAN 35 yrs in defence research. retired 1433 K V SESHASAYEE win broadband services. director 1434 T K S MOHAN 30 yrs experience I various management cadre. 1435 R SUBRAMONEIYAN POTTI ministry of defence,study of astrology 1437 R VAIDYANATHAN 1451 K NARAYANAN asst professor 1421 S Mahadevan Iyer BATCH – 15 REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION Consultant ; Retd Professor in 1516 Dr P Chandrashekar Rao CIRT,Pune. Engg.Mgmt work in pallavan tr 1518 M S GANESAN OWN BUSINESS corp as A E 1519 M S KALYANARAMAN mahindra company pilgrimage dept of defence 1522 C R KRISHNASWAMI production 35 yrs 1524 S MUTHUKRISHNAN caterpillar 1525 N R NARAYANASWAMY manager BOSCH. 1527 V A PARAMESHWARAN 47 yrs at india pistons ltd. 1529 N SABAPATHY 25 yrs in tnstc granite quarry mining operation 1531 R R SANKARASUBRAMANIAN SAEINDIA 1533 D SOLOMAN RICHARDSON nuclear power station BATCH – 16 REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1611 S.DAVID SARANATHAN Retired 1614 A.JEYARAGAVAN SOFT SKILL TRAINER AS MASTER DIPLOM IN TRAINING 1617 T.KRISHNAMURTHY Retired as COO layam consultantants Pvt. Ltd 1618 K.MUTHUKUMARASAMY retired and settled in trichy 1626 S.RAMAKRISHNAN retried 1627 R.Ramamoorthy Retired 1628 S.K.RAMANAN doing consultancy in QMS 1632 S.SAINATH Trustee in consumer Association of india 1634 S.SREEDHARAN 1636 V.THYAGARAJAN Baba Automic research R.Palanichamy ssm institute of technology principal 1627 R.Ramamoorthy Retired BATCH – 17 NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION B.SUNDARAM EX-PRESIDENT OF UNION MOTORS FOUNDER OF HORSE POWER MOTORS BATCH – 18 REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION Guest Madhavan. R Dept of Automobile Engg,MIT lecturer 1828 Prabhukumar R Business N.R.krishnaswamy 1821 S.lakshmannan gambakkam,chennai Ex-Mahindra &Mahindra Ltd & Agent - LIC of 18219 N R Krishnaswamy Bajaj Tempo India BATCH – 20 REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING 2020 K.M. Rajendran Retired BATCH – 21 NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION T S Dhanapalan Raja Gopalan R TVS Consultant BATCH – 24 REG NO NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION V. Business -Manufacturer- 24204 CHANDRAMOHA 3/4/1951 Proprietor Exporter of Auto Components N Dr. P. Mannar Retd Prof of Auto Engg Dept, 24209 3/10/1953 Former Vice Chancellor Jawahar MIT & Former VC, AU Jaisankarprasad PVD 24208 Mahilselvan 2/6/1953 retired director/power NLC Isaac Jeyaprakash Manohar G K 24216 Muthuraman RV 2/28/1951 Murugesan additional director ,irt 24215 10/20/1950 retired Subbiah taramani 24217 Nagapushanam 7/15/1951 kuwait managing director Muralidharan R Raju KP Ramamurthy S Vasudevan A k Sankaran S 24229 Sundaram S 24226 john sigamoney 11/9/1951 24214 murugan BATCH – 26 NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION N.Sekar Retired from service Soulwirn Wind Farms Ltd, Ramani. R. V Ch-83 Selvaraj. K. M Ram Brick Linings Ltd GM Palaniappan M.K BATCH – 27 REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION L. Sundar Ragavan Meenakshisundaram. Retired from 27207 J Caterpillar 27119 Ramanathan Ravi Free lancer consultant Deputy General Manager( Customer care 27223 Sree Raman. S. Tata Motors, Mumbai & DQCTC Camp) BATCH – 29 S.No REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 29202 Ashok Kumar Mishra NALCO, Odisha AGM 2 29206 Ashok Bright semi-retired 3 Devaraj. P Ashok Leyland PD 4 29210 Ganesan V Petrofac International Ltd Plant Manager 5 29217 Loganathan K OIL INDIA LTD CHIEF ENGINEER BATCH – 30 S.No NAME CURRENTLY WORKING 1 Velu Gm 2 Venkatesh N (ME) BOSCH 3 Govindarajan Enfield Motors BATCH – 31 S.No NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 Alwin Manohar IOC 2 Chandrasekaran. B Bi-Metal Bearings 3 Dharmlingam NTPC Director Regional 4 Manivannan Ashok Leyland Manager 5 Sridhar WAPCO-TVS Vice 6 Sundaram. T Lucas India Services Ltd President 7 Prem jayakumar Bharat university 8 MIHIR KUMAR BAL SAUD BAHWAN AUTOMOTIVE SDM B.S.ABDHUR RAHMAN UNIVERSITY 9 Dr.S.Prince Arockiadoss PROFESSOR VANDALUR BATCH – 32 S.NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING 1 Athinathan Ashok Leyland BATCH – 33 S.NO REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 Ilango. S Tata Motors, Bangalore RCS Manager 2 Pandurangan. D VRDE, DRDO Jt Director 3 Sivanesan.P Ashok Leyland 4 Balaji.V Concorde Motors 5 Baskaran.N R.f 6 Govindarajan.C CVRDe 7 Jagannathan.A Brakes India 8 Kumaravelu.C CVRDE 9 Raghupathy.B CAT 10 Raja.K 11 Ravi.T.S AL 12 Santosh Kumar.P Indian Airlines 13 Selva Raju.P SETC 14 Siva kumar.S CVRDE 15 Subramanian.V IRTT 16 Thangam.p TNSTC 17 Vasu.R Brakes India 18 Vijayakumar.L Indian Airlines 19 Vasantharaj.C KCT HOD -mechanical engineering 20 Adinathan 21 Murugan A 22 33220 RAVI TS BATCH – 34 S.N CURRENTLY REG NO NAME D.O.B DESIGNATION O WORKING Avia Ashok Lezland, Director, Research 1 34210 Jaya Kumar 28/05/1962 Prague, Czech and Development Republic 2 34224 Raja 13-05-60 sisa motors executive director 3 34201 R Anusam 01.06.1962 4 34202 R Asokan 22.08.1962 5 34203 A Balakichenan 26.01.1961 [email protected] 6 34204 R Devaraju 10.05.1961 7 34205 A Dhavakumar 17.08.1961 8 34206 Dilip kumar bania 31.12.1961 9 34208 S Ilango 01.12.1961 10 34209 S Ilangovan 11 34210 P Jayakumar 28.05.1962 12 34211 R Jayavel 20.09.1961 [email protected] S Habeeb-ur- 13 34213 05.01.1962 [email protected] raguman [email protected] 14 34214 R Kabeerdoss 01.01.1961 m 15 34215 S Kajamohideen 16 34216 M Kannan 18.05.1962 17 34217 A Kumarasamy 02.05.1962 18 34219 Kmahalingam 07.01.1960 19 34220 Manoranjan Lodha 20 34221 V Murugan 01.09.1962 21 34222 M Nallamadan 13.05.1962 22 34223 M Premkumar 29.06.1962 [email protected] 23 34224 P Raja 29.11.1960 m 24 34225 C Rajasundar 21.07.1961 25 34226 S Rajeswaran 25.05.1962 26 34227 K Rathinavelsamy 07.05.1962 27 34228 Sanjeev vijay 28 34229 S Selvarajan 17.02.1962 29 34230 M Shunmugarajan 06.03.1962 30 34232 R Sivasankaran 15.05.1962 31 34234 L Sridharan 18.08.1961 32 34235 N Sundararajan 17.06.1962 [email protected] 33 34237 K Thirumurugan 14.03.1962 34 34238 P Veeresparan 12.04.1962 35 34239 C N Velumani 22.07.1962 36 34241 V Vetrivendhan 01.05.1962 37 33340 K Jeyaraman 21.07.1960 38 34321 R Mahendiran 30.07.1961 39 34108 M Kumaresan 03.06.1961 40 34117 V Sarveswaran 10.05.1962 BATCH – 35 S.NO REG NO NAME CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 Abdul Rehman 2 35206 Baskaran BOSCH Ltd, Bangalore Vice President, R & D Regional Parts Manager, 3 Ganapathy Tata Motors, Bangalore Bangalore 4 Kanagaraj Tata Motors M Y Caterpillar Commercial Private 5 35237 6 Sigma - Black Belt Sivachandran Limited 6 Manohar Swaraj Dealership 7 Raja. N Ford India Ltd GM - National Sales 8 Ramamurthy 9 35241 A. Thangavel IP Rings Limited VP & Head - Rings Engineering 10 35219 DR.NABI Engg for u MD BATCH – 36 S.NO REG NO NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 Jaya Prakash. R Tata Motors, Chennai 2 T36224 Rajan Ganesan Dana Holding Corporation Gear Quality and Lab Manager BATCH – 37 S.N REG NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION O NO 2702 1 Siluvai muthu 19-01-55 SRM professor 2 Dr. 2 Venkatasamy. Saveetha Engg Coll principal R 3 Sarawathy. K Touchpoint Solns Divisional 4 Srinivasan Ashok Leyland Manager 5 Govindan Bank of America T 3721 6 NAMASIVAYA 14.09.1964 Indianoil Corporation Limited Sr.Manager(Engg) 5 M 3723 UNNI Sr. General 7 03.03.1963 Hero MotoCorp Ltd 2 KRISHNAN K.G Manager-R&D 3724 C TAMIL 8 07.10.1962 NALCO- Odisha AGM 6 SELVAN 3722 T.S.RAMKUMA 9 17.04.1964 KLN College Of Engg AP(Sr.Grade) 2 R 3721 NARAYANA MalaJewellers&FinancialServices+Ch 10 01.05.1965 Proprieter 6 KUMAR.S arteredAccountant 3720 Divisional 11 S.GANAPATHY TATA Motors LTD 4 Manager BATCH – 38 S.NO REG NO NAME D.O.B CURRENTLY WORKING DESIGNATION 1 K Swaminathan St.peters 2 Raja. P Hyundai Motor India Ltd Head - Service 13-04- 3 38220 Ravichandran. M. S not working.but consultant 65 4 38210 S N M BASIL POLYTECHNIC COLLEGEkerala H O D Chief Engineer & Site 5 38509 Paulraj Edwin Volvo India Private Limited Manager BATCH – 39 S.N REG CURRENTLY NAME D.O.B DESIGNATION O NO WORKING Krishnan Ashok Leyland - 1 39209 GM - Product Development Sadagopan Nissan 13th April 2 39213 Meiyappan.