5298 the London Gazette, 26 August, 1930
Total Page:16
File Type:pdf, Size:1020Kb
5298 THE LONDON GAZETTE, 26 AUGUST, 1930. REGIMENTAL LIST. The undermentioned Pilot Officers on pro- ROYAL ENGINEERS. bation are confirmed in rank:— ANTI-AIRCRAFT SEARCHLIGHT COMPANIES. Harold Edward DICKEN. 17th June 1930. Elias Charles Walter Stephen SMITH. Surrey Group—Lt. S. T. Dale, from Active 15th July 1930. List, to be Lt. 23rd Aug. 1930. The undermentioned Pilot Officers are INFANTRY. promoted to the rank of Flying Officer:— 28th Lond. B—Lt.-Col. (Bt. Col.) S. W. Charles Brian FIELD. 2nd May 1930. Neighbour, O.B.E., T.D., having attained the Thomas John REES. 8th July 1930. age limit retires and retains his rank, with Kenneth Alexander Keswick MAcEwEN. permission to wear the prescribed uniform. 25th July 1930. 23rd Aug. 1930. Herbert Reginald DALE. 22nd Aug. 1930. MEMORANDA. Group Captain George Ivan CARMICHAEL, Capt. Geoffrey Elliott Blackett, formerly D.S.O., A.F.C., is placed on the half-pay 8th Bn. Durham L.I., on conviction by the list, scale A., 26th Aug. 1930 to 14th Sept. Civil Power, is deprived of the rank of 1930, inclusive. Capt. 3rd July 1930. Flight Lt. Henry Victor GERMAN is placed Lt. Charles Richard Eastoe, formerly 5th on the retired list. 26th Aug. 1930. Bn. Norfolk R., on conviction by the Civil The undermentioned are transferred to the Power, is deprived of the rank of Lt. 7th Reserve, Class C.: — July 1930. Flight Lt. Duncan Stratford Eyre VINES. 15th Aug. 1930. Flying Officer Sidney Harry WHITE. 16th Aug. 1930. Air Ministry, Flying Officer Robert Thomas READ relin- 26th August, 1930. quishes his short service commission on account of ill-health, llth Aug. 1930. ROYAL AIR FORCE. Lt. Charles Lindsey KEIGHLY-PEACH, R.N., Flying Officer, R.A.F., ceases to be attached GENERAL DUTIES BRANCH. to the R.A.F. on return to Naval duty. The undermentioned flight cadets having 14th Aug. 1930. successfully passed through the R.A.F. College, Oranwell, are granted permanent MEDICAL BRANCH. commissions, as Pilot Officers with effect Maurice PEARSON, M.R.C.S., L.R.C.P., from and with seniority of 26th July 1930:— L.D.S., R.C.S., is granted a temporary com- Patric Bernard COOTE. mission as a Flying Officer, with effect from David Victor ANGELL. and with seniority of 1st June 1930. Thomas Ulric Curzon SHIRLEY. Flight Lt. Cornelius William COFFEY, John WETTEHEAD. L.R.C.P. & S., is transferred to the Reserve, Albert Q~illim CLELAND. Class D. (ii). 24th Aug. 1930. Henry Bertram WRIGLEY. DEXTAL BRANCH. Walter Philip George PRETTY. Charles Eric LITTLER. Flight Lt. Patrick Edward BROWN, Morgan Brownson EDWARDS. L.D.S., is promoted to the rank of Squadron Geoffrey Dalton STEPHENSON. Leader on promotion to Major in the Army Denis George VAUGHAN-FOWLER. Dental Corps. 14th July 1930. Robert Bruce DASHPER. Nigel Charles WALKER. James Winter Carmichael MORE. RESERVE OF AIR FORCE OFFICERS. John Anthony CHANCE. GENERAL DUTIES BRANCH. Cyril Edgar Joseph BAINES. Douglas Eobert Stewart BADER. The undermentioned are granted commis- Dennis Brian Douglas FIELD. sions in Class A. A. (ii) as Pilot Officers on Jack Stewart NEWCOMBE. probation:— William Robert WILLS-SANDFORD. Anthony Isaac Alexander McDouGALL. John Peter MASSEY. 19th J.une 1930. John Malcolm Douglas KER. 12th Aug. The undermentioned are granted short 1930. service coin missions as Pilot Officers for four years on the active list with effect from and Flying Officer Charles Sidney CLARKE is with seniority of 12th Aug. 1930:— transferred from Class A. to Class C. 24th Cecil Eric SPENCER. Aug. 1930. George Simpson COLEMAN. Flying Officer William Frost DAVENPORT Hugh Oswald WOODHOTTSB. relinquishes his commission on completion Reginald William Holder HARRISON. of service. 4th July 1930. Eric Cecil BATES. Flying Officer John Edward CLAYTON resigns his commission. 1st Aug. 1930. Capt. Alfred Basil WOODHALL, R.M., Flying Officer Anthony White WOOD relin- Flight Lt., E.A.F., is granted a permanent qjuishes his commission on completion of commission as a Flight Lt. with effect from service. 26th May 1930. (Substituted for 1st Aug. 1930, and with seniority of 1st the notification in the Gazette of 1st July July 1929. 1930.).